Gholam, Bassam Ibrahim Ahmad (CPSO#: 70992)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greater Niagara General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: (905) 359-7443
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

701 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A2
Canada
Phone: (289) 768-7246
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bassam Gholam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 21 2010


Corporation Name: Dr. Bassam Gholam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Gholam ( CPSO# 70992 )

Business Address:
Unit 100
701 Main Street
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A2
Phone Number: (289) 768-7246

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BASSAM IBRAHIM AHMAD GHOLAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOLAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 28 Feb 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 1998 to 28 Feb 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 1999 to 29 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2011

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)