Gholami, Sogand (CPSO#: 95130)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: Gholami Ghasemabadi, Sogand (used until: 28 Apr 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10243 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3B2
Phone: (905) 237-8755
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sogand Gholami Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gholami ( CPSO# 95130 )

Business Address:
10243 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3B2
Phone Number: (905) 237-8755

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Mar 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOGAND GHOLAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOLAMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2014