Ghomeshi, Hooman Reza (CPSO#: 76932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Haldimand General Hospital
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone: (905) 768-3311
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ghomeshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ghomeshi ( CPSO# 76932 )

Business Address:
West Haldimand General Hospital
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone Number: (905) 768-3311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jul 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOOMAN REZA GHOMESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOMESHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

McMaster University, 05 Jan 2009 to 17 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2009