Ghorab, Zeina (CPSO#: 81735)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Apr 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Tichreen, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anatomic Pathology
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue Room E433
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7355
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zeina Ghorab Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Ghorab ( CPSO# 81735 )

Business Address:
Department of Anatomic Pathology
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue Room E433
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 19 Apr 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Zeina  Ghorab  may  practice medicine independently in Anatomic Pathology,
            only.