Ghosh, Nina (CPSO#: 82444)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Merivale Cardiovascular Consultants
Suite 201
1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone: 613 7228086
Fax: (613) 761-1944
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Univ of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Carleton Place Hospital
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nina Ghosh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ghosh ( CPSO# 82444 )

Business Address:
201 - 1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8
Phone Number: (613) 722-8086

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-5000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NINA GHOSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2010