Ghoul, Suha Marwan Musa (CPSO#: 94288)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Jordan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Jul 2010 to 27 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2014