Ghumman, Ejaz Ahmed (CPSO#: 86121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Persian, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leamington District Memorial
Hospital
1st Floor
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 326-2830
Fax: (519) 326-4461
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ejaz Ghumman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ghumman ( CPSO# 86121 )

Business Address:
Leamington District Memorial Hospital
Room 114
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 326-2830

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 23 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 21, 2017, by order of the Discipline Committee of the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions and
            limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ejaz
            Ahmed Ghumman:

            Chief of Staff Role

            a)    Dr. Ghumman shall not re-apply for the Chief of Staff position at any
                  hospital until successful completion of the re-assessment described in
                  paragraph 11 below.

            Clinical Supervision

            a)    Dr. Ghumman shall retain a College-approved Clinical Supervisor who will
                  sign an undertaking in the form attached hereto as Schedule "A";

            b)    For a period of twelve (12) months commencing on the date that the
                  Clinical Supervisor is approved by the College, Dr. Ghumman may practise
                  only under the supervision of the Clinical Supervisor;

            c)    Clinical Supervision of Dr. Ghumman's practice shall contain the
                  following elements:

            Moderate-Level Supervision

            a)    For an initial period of approximately four (4) weeks, the Clinical
                  Supervisor will engage in a period of moderate-level supervision, during
                  which time the Clinical Supervisor will at minimum:

                  (i)   Review materials provided by the College and have an initial
                        in-person meeting with Dr. Ghumman to discuss practice improvement
                        recommendations;
                  (ii)  Thereafter, discuss with Dr.  Ghumman once a week by telephone or
                        secure electronic video conference to pre-clear all general surgery
                        cases done in the operating room under a general anaesthetic;
                  (iii) For on-call cases where Dr. Ghumman is not able to speak to his
                        Clinical Supervisor prior to surgery, the Clinical Supervisor will
                        review such cases as soon as possible after the surgery and in any
                        event within approximately 24 hours post-surgery by telephone or
                        secure electronic video conference;
                  (iv)  Provide reports to the College once every two (2) weeks, or more
                        frequently if the Clinical supervisor has concerns about Dr.
                        Ghumman's standard of practice or conduct;
                  (v)   Discuss with Dr. Ghumman any concerns the Clinical Supervisor may
                        have arising from his meetings with Dr. Ghumman and case reviews;
                  (vi)  Make recommendations for practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development, and inquire into Dr. Ghumman's compliance
                        with any recommendations;
                  (vii) Keep a log of all patient charts reviewed along with patient
                        identifiers.
                  
            Low-Level Supervision Phase 1

            a)    After the first four (4) weeks of Dr. Ghumman's Moderate-Level Clinical
                  Supervision, upon receipt of a written recommendation from the Clinical
                  Supervisor that Dr. Ghumman is ready to practise under Low-Level Clinical
                  Supervision, and subject to approval by the College, Clinical Supervision
                  shall continue for a further period of eight (8) weeks during which time
                  the Clinical Supervisor will at minimum:

                  (i)   Meet with Dr. Ghumman once every two (2) weeks in person to discuss
                        surgical cases and review a minimum of fifteen (15) patient charts,
                        to be selected in the sole discretion of the Clinical Supervisor,
                        and discuss any issues or concerns arising therefrom with Dr.
                        Ghumman. If the Clinical Supervisor is of the view that fewer than
                        fifteen (15) charts may be reviewed in this period, the Clinical
                        Supervisor shall provide a written recommendation to the College
                        and, subject to approval by the College, may review no fewer than
                        ten (10) patient charts per visit for the remaining portion of this
                        period of clinical supervision;
                  (ii)  Provide reports to the College once per month, or more frequently
                        if the Clinical supervisor has concerns about Dr. Ghumman's
                        standard of practice or conduct;
                  (iii) Discuss with Dr. Ghumman any concerns the Clinical Supervisor may
                        have arising from his meetings with Dr. Ghumman and chart reviews;
                  (iv)  Make recommendations for practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development, and inquire into Dr. Ghumman's compliance
                        with any recommendations;
                  (v)   Keep a log of all patient charts reviewed along with patient
                        identifiers.
                  
            Low-Level Supervision Phase 2

            a)    After the first eight (8) weeks of  Low-Level Clinical Supervision, upon
                  receipt of a written recommendation from the Clinical Supervisor and
                  subject to approval by the College, Clinical Supervision shall continue
                  at Low-Level for the balance of the twelve (12) months of Clinical
                  Supervision, during which time the Clinical Supervisor will at minimum:

                  (i)   Meet with Dr. Ghumman once a month in person to discuss surgical
                        cases and review a minimum of ten (10) patient charts, to be
                        selected in the sole discretion of the Clinical Supervisor, and
                        discuss any issues or concerns arising therefrom with Dr. Ghumman;
                  (ii)  Provide reports to the College once every two months or more
                        frequently if the Clinical supervisor has concerns about Dr.
                        Ghumman's standard of practice or conduct;
                  (iii) Discuss with Dr. Ghumman any concerns the Clinical Supervisor may
                        have arising from his meetings with Dr. Ghumman and chart reviews;
                  (iv)  Make recommendations for practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development, and inquire into Dr. Ghumman's compliance
                        with any recommendations;
                  (v)   Keep a log of all patient charts reviewed along with patient
                        identifiers.
                  
            Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") 

            a)    The Clinical Supervisor shall facilitate completion of the education
                  program, set out in an IEP to be provided to the Clinical Supervisor by
                  the College, and shall report to the College in his/her reports as to Dr.
                  Ghumman's progress in completing the IEP.

            Other Elements of Clinical Supervision

            a)    Throughout the period of Clinical Supervision, Dr. Ghumman shall abide by
                  the recommendations of the Clinical Supervisor and shall complete the IEP
                  in co-operation with the Clinical Supervisor;

            b)    If a clinical supervisor who has given an undertaking as set out in
                  Schedule "A" to this Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill
                  its terms, Dr. Ghumman shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice
                  of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a person
                  who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                  College within that time;

            c)    If Dr. Ghumman is unable to obtain a clinical supervisor in accordance
                  with this Order, he shall cease to practice until such time as he has
                  done so;

            d)    Dr. Ghumman shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Supervisor to
                  the College, and by the College to his Clinical Supervisor, of all
                  information the Clinical Supervisor or the College deems necessary or
                  desirable in order to fulfill the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking and
                  Dr. Ghumman's compliance with this Order.

            Re-Assessment

            a)    Approximately six (6) months after the completion of the period of
                  supervision set out above Dr. Ghumman shall undergo a re-assessment of
                  his practice, at his own expense, by a College-appointed assessor (the
                  "Assessor(s)").  The re-assessment shall include the elements outlined in
                  the IEP, to be provided by the College. The Assessor(s) shall report the
                  results of the re-assessment to the College;

            b)    Dr. Ghumman shall consent to the disclosure to the Assessor(s) of the
                  reports of the Clinical Supervisor arising from the supervision, and
                  shall consent to the sharing of all information between the Clinical
                  Supervisor, the Assessor(s) and the College, as the College deems
                  necessary or desirable in order to fulfill their respective obligations. 

            Monitoring 

            a)    Dr. Ghumman shall inform the College of each and every location where he
                  practices, in any jurisdiction (his "Practice Location(s)") within
                  fifteen (15) days of this Order and shall inform the College of any and
                  all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            b)    Dr. Ghumman shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice
                  and patient charts by one or more College representative(s) for the
                  purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this
                  Order.

            c)    Dr.  Ghuman  shall  consent  to  the  College's  making  appropriate
                  enquiries of  the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or
                  institution that may have relevant  information,   in  order  for  the
                  College  to  monitor   and   enforce his compliance with the terms of
                  this Order.

            d)    Dr. Ghumman shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with
                  implementing the terms of this Order.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Jul 2017
Summary:

On July 21, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ejaz Ahmed Ghumman committed an 
act of professional misconduct in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession. 
  
Dr. Ghumman is a general surgeon practising at the hospital in a city in Ontario. From 2007, Dr. 
Ghumman was a Chief of Staff at the hospital, but resigned his position in April 2017, following 
a referral of this matter to the Discipline Committee of the College.  
 
Dr. Ghumman received his medical degree in Pakistan in 1982 and a specialist qualification in 
general surgery in Ireland in 1991. In 1999, Dr. Ghumman obtained a certificate of independent 
practice in Newfoundland and received his specialist qualification in general surgery in Canada 
in 2004. In 2007, Dr. Ghumman received his certificate of independent practice in Ontario. 
 
Failure to Maintain Standard of Practice of the Profession: Patient X 
 
In June, 2015, Patient X complained to the College regarding Dr. Ghumman’s care in conducting 
her laparoscopic gallbladder removal surgery and his post-operative care. 
 
Several months prior to the complaint, Dr. Ghumman assessed Patient X for symptomatic gall 
stones. He explained to Patient X her treatment options, discussed the potential risks and benefits 
of surgery, and obtained Patient X’s informed consent for a laparoscopic gallbladder removal 
surgery, which was scheduled for the following month. On the day of the surgery, Dr. Ghumman 
discussed the surgical plan with Patient X in the day surgery area at the hospital.  
 
During the surgery, the clip applier that Dr. Ghumman applied on Patient X’s cystic artery 
unexpectedly jammed and could not be pulled off as it could damage an artery. Dr. Ghumman 
considered converting to an open procedure, but decided to continue laparoscopically and to take 
steps to divide the cystic artery in order to remove the jammed clip applier. 
 
Following the anesthetist’s suggestion to use Filshie clips, which are applied with a narrower 
clipper than other clips, Dr. Ghumman proceeded to place a Filshie clip, but was concerned that 
he might have mistakenly placed it on the common bile duct or the right hepatic artery.  Dr. 
Ghumman directed nurses to make several telephone calls, but could not find a way to remove the 
Filshie clip without risking torn vessels or tearing the bile duct.  
 
He continued with the procedure and applied another Filshie clip on the cystic artery, which 
allowed him to divide the cystic artery and remove the jammed clipper.  
 
Dr. Ghumman removed the gallbladder, which tore during removal, placed a drain and completed 
the surgery. He noted in his Operative Report that if a clip is on a common bile duct, he may have 
to refer Patient X to a Hepatobiliary Surgeon.   
 
Following the surgery, Dr. Ghumman told Patient X that the surgery went well. He indicated that 
he encountered a complication when the clipper jammed, which he was then able to remove, but 
was concerned that he might have placed a clip on her right hepatic artery or common bile duct.  
 
Patient X was discharged home the same day with instructions for monitoring and to return two 
days later for a CT scan and to remove the drain placed during surgery.  
 
When Patient X returned two days later, she reported feeling unwell, was in pain, and was having 
trouble eating. Dr. Ghumman discussed the results of Patient X’s CT scan with a radiologist at the 
hospital, who opined that Patient X’s common bile duct looked normal and indicated that no clip 
was visualized on the common bile duct. Dr. Ghumman reported to Patient X’s family doctor that 
he had a small incident during surgery but that he was satisfied, after the CT scan, that the clip 
was not on the common bile duct. He indicated that he was concerned because he had applied the 
clip “a little bit blind”, but now felt the clip was on tissues along the gallbladder, which was not a 
problem. Dr. Ghumman decided not to remove the drain that day and instructed Patient X to 
return three days later for removal of the drain and follow up tests.  
 
When Patient X returned to Dr. Ghumman for drain removal three days later, she reported feeling 
itchy, was unable to eat, and her complexion was jaundiced. 
       
The next day, Dr. Ghumman telephoned Patient X and informed her that according to her blood 
work results her bilirubin was high. Elevated bilirubin levels may cause jaundice and may indicate 
problems with the liver or bile duct, and may also account for the type of itching experienced by 
Patient X. Dr. Ghumman advised Patient X to drink plenty of fluids to stay well hydrated and call 
his office if her condition worsened.   
 
In two days, Patient X contacted Dr. Ghumman and complained of increased itching. He booked 
an ultrasound appointment and blood work for the next morning. The ultrasound results suggested 
that the common bile duct was obstructed and blood work indicated that Patient X’s bilirubin had 
increased over the previous three days. Dr. Ghumman advised Patient X that the clip he was 
concerned about had actually been placed incorrectly and had likely caused obstruction of the 
patient’s common bile duct. He organized Patient X’s immediate transportation to London Health 
Sciences Centre (“London”) for emergency admission and surgery. 
       
Following the surgery, the Hepatobiliary Surgeon noted that there was a clip going across Patient 
X’s entire bile duct. The surgery was complicated by intra-operative and post-operative bleeding, 
which required transfusion of eight units of blood. Patient X remained hospitalized in London for 
approximately one week after the surgery. 
 
In October, 2015, the College retained an expert, a general surgeon, to provide opinion regarding 
Dr. Gumman’s care of Patient X. The expert opined that although the technical complication 
involving the clip applier during surgery was beyond Dr. Ghumman’s control, his actions in 
response to the problem were below the standard of practice of the profession. He noted the 
following concerns: 
 
 - Dr. Ghumman failed to convert to an open procedure in order to first define the anatomy with 
   careful dissection around the jammed clipper; 
 - Despite his concern of having injured an important structure, Dr. Ghumman failed to obtain 
   the advice of a hepatobiliary surgeon or another general surgeon, either during or 
   immediately following the surgery. Although there was only one other surgeon in a hospital 
   in a small community where he works, he could have sought assistance through a service that 
   provides urgent and emergent support for hospital-based physicians; 
 - Dr. Ghumman’s operative note shows that he was aware of the need to obtain the critical 
   view, but he placed the Filshie clip applier in the area of undissected tissue;  
 - The fact that there was a retained portion of a surgical bag after the surgical procedure 
   demonstrates a lack of care and poor technique. 
 
 
Failure to Maintain the Standard of Practice of the Profession – Other Patients 
 
Subsequently, the College commenced an investigation under s.75 (1)(a) of the Health 
Professions Procedural Code into Dr. Ghumman’s surgical practice. The College-retained expert 
and the expert retained by Dr. Ghumman reviewed Dr. Ghumman’s twenty-five patient charts. 
Both experts opined that Dr. Ghumman failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession in the following areas: 
       
 - Prolonged and unnecessary use of prophylactic antibiotics post-operatively with respect to 
   some patients. While there was no evidence of actual harm, overuse of antibiotics presents a 
   risk of potential harm to patients, particularly in the hospital setting where there is a risk that 
   antibiotic resistance will make treatment of infections more difficult. This issue was described 
   as minor by both experts; 
 - Overuse of surgical drains in some patients, in the absence of evidence of an abscess 
   requiring drainage or the development of post-operative collection of clear fluid. There was 
   no evidence of actual harm or potential risk of harm to patients. This issue was described as 
   minor by both experts; 
 - Deficient record-keeping pertaining to incomplete documentation of the patients’ consent to a 
   colonoscopy. There was no evidence of actual harm to any patient. 
 
On July 21, 2017, the Committee ordered and directed on the matter of penalty and costs that: 
 
 - The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Ghumman’s 
   Certificate of Registration: 
  
     Chief of Staff Role 
     a)  Dr. Ghumman shall not re-apply for the Chief of Staff position at any hospital until 
         successful completion of the re-assessment described below. 
     
     Clinical Supervision 
     (a) Dr. Ghumman shall retain a College-approved Clinical Supervisor who will sign an 
         undertaking in the form attached as Schedule “A” to the Order; 
     (b) For a period of twelve (12) months commencing on the date that the Clinical 
         Supervisor is approved by the College, Dr. Ghumman may practise only under the 
         supervision of the Clinical Supervisor; 
     (c) Clinical Supervision of Dr. Ghumman’s practice shall contain the following 
         elements: 
     
     Moderate-Level Supervision 
     a)  For an initial period of approximately four (4) weeks, the Clinical Supervisor will 
         engage in a period of moderate-level supervision, during which time the Clinical 
         Supervisor will at minimum: 
         (i)  Review materials provided by the College and have an initial in-person 
              meeting with Dr. Ghumman to discuss practice improvement 
              recommendations; 
         (ii) Thereafter, discuss with Dr.  Ghumman once a week by telephone or secure 
              electronic video conference to pre-clear all general surgery cases done in the 
              operating room under a general anaesthetic; 
    (iii) For on-call cases where Dr. Ghumman is not able to speak to his Clinical 
         Supervisor prior to surgery, the Clinical Supervisor will review such cases as 
         soon as possible after the surgery and in any event within approximately 24 
         hours post-surgery by telephone or secure electronic video conference; 
    (iv) Provide reports to the College once every two (2) weeks, or more frequently if 
         the Clinical supervisor has concerns about Dr. Ghumman’s standard of practice 
         or conduct; 
    (v)  Discuss with Dr. Ghumman any concerns the Clinical Supervisor may have 
         arising from his meetings with Dr. Ghumman and case reviews; 
    (vi) Make recommendations for practice improvements and ongoing professional 
         development, and inquire into Dr. Ghumman’s compliance with any 
         recommendations; 
    (vii) Keep a log of all patient charts reviewed along with patient identifiers. 
 
Low-Level Supervision Phase 1 
a)  After the first four (4) weeks of Dr. Ghumman’s Moderate-Level Clinical 
    Supervision, upon receipt of a written recommendation from the Clinical Supervisor 
    that Dr. Ghumman is ready to practise under Low-Level Clinical Supervision, and 
    subject to approval by the College, Clinical Supervision shall continue for a further 
    period of eight (8) weeks during which time the Clinical Supervisor will at 
    minimum: 
    (A)  Meet with Dr. Ghumman once every two (2) weeks in person to discuss 
         surgical cases and review a minimum of fifteen (15) patient charts, to be 
         selected in the sole discretion of the Clinical Supervisor, and discuss any issues 
         or concerns arising therefrom with Dr. Ghumman. If the Clinical Supervisor is 
         of the view that fewer than fifteen (15) charts may be reviewed in this period, 
         the Clinical Supervisor shall provide a written recommendation to the College 
         and, subject to approval by the College, may review no fewer than ten (10) 
         patient charts per visit for the remaining portion of this period of clinical 
         supervision; 
    (B)  Provide reports to the College once per month, or more frequently if the 
         Clinical supervisor has concerns about Dr. Ghumman’s standard of practice or 
         conduct; 
    (C)  Discuss with Dr. Ghumman any concerns the Clinical Supervisor may have 
         arising from his meetings with Dr. Ghumman and chart reviews; 
    (D)  Make recommendations for practice improvements and ongoing professional 
         development, and inquire into Dr. Ghumman’s compliance with any 
         recommendations; 
    (E)  Keep a log of all patient charts reviewed along with patient identifiers. 
    
Low-Level Supervision Phase 2 
a)  After the first eight (8) weeks of  Low-Level Clinical Supervision, upon receipt of a 
    written recommendation from the Clinical Supervisor and subject to approval by the 
    College, Clinical Supervision shall continue at Low-Level for the balance of the 
    twelve (12) months of Clinical Supervision, during which time the Clinical 
    Supervisor will at minimum: 
    (i)  Meet with Dr. Ghumman once a month in person to discuss surgical cases and 
         review a minimum of ten (10) patient charts, to be selected in the sole 
         discretion of the Clinical Supervisor, and discuss any issues or concerns arising 
         therefrom with Dr. Ghumman; 
    (ii) Provide reports to the College once every two months or more frequently if the 
         Clinical supervisor has concerns about Dr. Ghumman’s standard of practice or 
         conduct; 
    (iii) Discuss with Dr. Ghumman any concerns the Clinical Supervisor may have 
         arising from his meetings with Dr. Ghumman and chart reviews; 
    (iv) Make recommendations for practice improvements and ongoing professional 
         development, and inquire into Dr. Ghumman’s compliance with any 
         recommendations; 
    (v) Keep a log of all patient charts reviewed along with patient identifiers. 
              
Individualized Education Plan (“IEP”)  
 a) The Clinical Supervisor shall facilitate completion of the education program, set out 
    in an IEP to be provided to the Clinical Supervisor by the College, and shall report to 
    the College in his/her reports as to Dr. Ghumman’s progress in completing the IEP.  
                  
Other Elements of Clinical Supervision 
a)  Throughout the period of Clinical Supervision, Dr. Ghumman shall abide by the 
    recommendations of the Clinical Supervisor and shall complete the IEP in co-
    operation with the Clinical Supervisor; 
b)  If a clinical supervisor who has given an undertaking as set out in Schedule “A” to 
    this Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, Dr. Ghumman shall, 
    within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking 
    in the same form from a person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is 
    delivered to the College within that time; 
c)  If Dr. Ghumman is unable to obtain a clinical supervisor in accordance with this 
    Order, he shall cease to practice until such time as he has done so; 
d)  Dr. Ghumman shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Supervisor to the 
    College, and by the College to his Clinical Supervisor, of all information the Clinical 
    Supervisor or the College deems necessary or desirable in order to fulfill the Clinical 
    Supervisor’s undertaking and Dr. Ghumman’s compliance with this Order. 
              
Re-Assessment 
a)  Approximately six (6) months after the completion of the period of supervision set 
    out above Dr. Ghumman shall undergo a re-assessment of his practice, at his own 
    expense, by a College-appointed assessor (the “Assessor(s)”).  The re-assessment 
    shall include the elements outlined in the IEP, to be provided by the College. The 
    Assessor(s) shall report the results of the re-assessment to the College; 
b)  Dr. Ghumman shall consent to the disclosure to the Assessor(s) of the reports of the 
    Clinical Supervisor arising from the supervision, and shall consent to the sharing of 
    all information between the Clinical Supervisor, the Assessor(s) and the College, as 
    the College deems necessary or desirable in order to fulfill their respective 
    obligations.  
                  
Monitoring  
a)  Dr. Ghumman shall inform the College of each and every location where he 
    practices, in any jurisdiction (his “Practice Location(s)”) within  fifteen (15) days of 
        this Order and shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within 
        fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location. 
    b)  Dr. Ghumman shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and 
        patient charts by one or more College representative(s) for the purpose of monitoring 
        and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order. 
    c)  Dr.  Ghuman  shall  consent  to  the  College’s  making  appropriate  enquiries of  the 
        Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution that may have relevant  
        information,   in  order  for  the  College  to  monitor   and   enforce his compliance 
        with the terms of this Order. 
    d)  Dr. Ghumman shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with 
        implementing the terms of this Order. 
              
- Dr. Ghumman appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
- Dr. Ghumman to pay costs to the College for a one day hearing in the amount of $5,500.00 
  within 30 days of the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): July 21, 2017

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 13, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)