Gibbons, Maria Kazimiera (CPSO#: 79412)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: (519) 370-4047
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grey Bruce Health Services
Emergency Department
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Canada
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Ext. 2029
Fax: (519) 376-3888
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Gibbons and Caulfeild, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gibbons ( CPSO# 79412 )
Dr. J. Caulfeild ( CPSO# 76408 )

Business Address:
Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 470-3030

Business Address:
Suite 7205
1800 - 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 372-1807

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA KAZIMIERA GIBBONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIBBONS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2006