Gibson, Gillian Mildred (CPSO#: 108990)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pinecrest-Queensway
Community Health Centre
1365 Richmond Road
Ottawa ON  K2B 6R7
Phone: (613) 820-4922
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GILLIAN MILDRED GIBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIBSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 2017