Giddens, Jonathan Lee (CPSO#: 68091)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Nov 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone: (905) 874-0092
Fax: (905) 874-0703
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Giddens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Giddens ( CPSO# 68091 )

Business Address:
101 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: (905) 874-0092

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN LEE GIDDENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIDDENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1999