Gidwani, Andy Jose (CPSO#: 77544)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Mar 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Health Care Centre
130 Adelaide St. West
Lower Concourse
P.O.Box 92
Toronto ON  M5H 3P5
Phone: (416) 361-6142
Fax: (416) 361-1200
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andy J. Gidwani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gidwani ( CPSO# 77544 )

Business Address:
Royal Health Care Centre
130 Adelaide Street West
Lower Concourse
P.O. Box 92
Toronto ON  M5H 3P5
Phone Number: (416) 361-6142

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Mar 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDY JOSE GIDWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIDWANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2003 to 31 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Feb 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2005