Gien, Lilian Tran (CPSO#: 76107)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre, T2-104
Division of Gynecologic Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4378
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jenkinson Gien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jenkinson ( CPSO# 76066 )
Dr. L. Gien ( CPSO# 76107 )

Business Address:
Sunnybook Health Science Centre
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
Room MG 321
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6160

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre, T2-104
Division of Gynecologic Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4026

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILIAN TRAN GIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2009