Gilani, Ammar Anwar (CPSO#: 78591)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Jul 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Medicine,
McMaster University
Room A3-12, 711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 389-4411 Ext. 42760
Fax: (905) 381-7042
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

668 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 4T9
Canada
Phone: (905) 538-4146
Fax: (905) 538-4147
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ammar Gilani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gilani ( CPSO# 78591 )
Dr. S. Gilani ( CPSO# 78712 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Medicine,
McMaster University-Room A3-12
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
668 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 4T9
Phone Number: (905) 538-4146

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 07 Jul 2004 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jan 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Ammar Anwar Gilani may practise medicine independently in neurology, only.