Gilani, Sadia (CPSO#: 78712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
668 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 4T9
Phone: (905) 538-4146
Fax: (905) 538-4147
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ammar Gilani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gilani ( CPSO# 78591 )
Dr. S. Gilani ( CPSO# 78712 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Medicine,
McMaster University-Room A3-12
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
668 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 4T9
Phone Number: (905) 538-4146

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 Apr 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SADIA GILANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 16 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2008