Gilbert, Jaclyn Christina (CPSO#: 95131)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Department Of Anesthesia
C6001, 6th Floor
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-469-6580 Ext. 2321
Fax: 416-469-7660
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jaclyn Gilbert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gilbert ( CPSO# 95131 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
30 Bond Street
Room 1-026 Shuter
Toronto ON  M5B 1X1
Phone Number: (416) 864-5071

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACLYN CHRISTINA GILBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILBERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016