Gile, David Stuart (CPSO#: 60676)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Feb 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldiers Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parna-Gile Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Parna ( CPSO# 63660 )
Dr. D. Gile ( CPSO# 60676 )

Business Address:
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 326-1178

Business Address:
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colbourne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID STUART GILE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1992