Giles, Keely Elise McMillan Johnston (CPSO#: 95700)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carling Broadview Medical Centre
770 Broadview Ave- Suite 305
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 728-7700
Fax: 613728-5848
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sensenbrenner Hospital
101 Progress Cres
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H6
Canada
Phone: 705-337-6111
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Rd, Leeds Grenville
Kemptville, ON
K0G1J0
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: 613-258-6133 Ext. 172
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Kim McMillan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Giles ( CPSO# 95700 )
Dr. S. McMillan ( CPSO# 51177 )

Business Address:
326 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 2C2
Phone Number: (905) 648-1517


Corporation Name: Keely E M J Giles Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Giles ( CPSO# 95700 )

Business Address:
305 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 728-7700

Business Address:
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-3435

Business Address:
101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H6
Phone Number: (705) 337-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEELY ELISE MCMILLAN JOHNSTON GILES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2013 to 21 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2013