Gill, Aftab Ahmed (CPSO#: 97005)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Scottish Conjoint Board(Scottish triple), 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 Nov 2011 to 13 Jan 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 14 Jan 2012 to 06 Nov 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012