Gill, Sandeep Kaur (CPSO#: 93067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 110
231 OakPark Boulevard
Oakville ON  L6H 7S8
Phone: (905) 901-5111
Fax: (905) 901-5122
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sandeep Gill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gill ( CPSO# 93067 )

Business Address:
Suite 110
231 OakPark Boulevard
Oakville ON  L6H 7S8
Phone Number: (905) 901-5111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDEEP KAUR GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012