Gill, Satinderpal Singh (CPSO#: 92805)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maitland Valley Family Health Team
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone: (519) 524-6060
Fax: (519) 524-5225
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Clinton Public Hospital
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
98 Shipley Street
Clinton
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Canada
Phone: (519) 482-3440
Fax: (519) 482-8752
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

Alexandra Marine & General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Canada
Phone: (519) 524-8689
Fax: (519) 524-5579
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.S. Gill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gill ( CPSO# 92805 )
Dr. K. Treasurywala ( CPSO# 90879 )

Business Address:
Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone Number: (519) 524-6060

Business Address:
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
98 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 482-3440

Business Address:
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone Number: (519) 524-8689

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SATINDERPAL SINGH GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012