Giller, Kristin Elizbaeth (CPSO#: 93124)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uxbridge Health Centre
2 Elgin Park Dr., Unit B
Uxbridge ON  L9P 0B1
Phone: (905) 852-1009
Fax: (905) 852-3531
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Urgent Care
110 Copper Creek Drive, Suite 100
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-8911
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kristin E. Giller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Giller ( CPSO# 93124 )

Business Address:
Uxbridge Health Centre
Unit B - 2 Elgin Park Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 852-1009

Business Address:
Markham-Stouffville Urgent Care
Suite 100
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 472-8911

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTIN ELIZBAETH GILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012