Gillett, Michael Kevin (CPSO#: 75646)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Other

Education:University of London, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael K. Gillett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 77 Glendon Rd Stratford, ON N5A 5B2
Date Received: 09 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018