Gillies, Mary-Melinda Louise (CPSO#: 85255)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary-Melinda Gillies Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 9 2011

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933 2904 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 01 Mar 2012

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011