Gilloteaux, Laurent Christophe (CPSO#: 81765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:NORTHEASTERN OHIO UNIVERSITIES, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
Scarborough Hospital-General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 431-8107
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Radiologists
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-6636
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laurent Gilloteaux Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gilloteaux ( CPSO# 81765 )

Business Address:
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8107


Corporation Name: Aziza Clemens Gilloteaux Kundu Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Clemens ( CPSO# 50261 )
Dr. L. Gilloteaux ( CPSO# 81765 )
Dr. B. Budisin ( CPSO# 77508 )
Dr. J. Aziza ( CPSO# 54826 )
Dr. S. Kundu ( CPSO# 68121 )
Dr. B. Shuckett ( CPSO# 33666 )
Dr. J. Nazareno ( CPSO# 77684 )
Dr. J. Woodley-Cook ( CPSO# 90936 )
Dr. M. Shoichet ( CPSO# 88856 )

Business Address:
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite G03
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Street East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8107

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURENT CHRISTOPHE GILLOTEAUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILLOTEAUX is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Jul 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2006