Gilman, Ashley Read (CPSO#: 94902)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Anova Fertility
Suite 650
25 Sheppard Ave W
Toronto ON  M2N 6S6
Phone: (416) 225-4440
Fax: (416) 640-9454
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHLEY READ GILMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Mar 2011 to 08 Apr 2011
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 18 Oct 2013
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2015