Gilmour, Julie Anne (CPSO#: 93869)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Health Centre
Endocrinology Offices, 7th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7460 Ext. 8183
Fax: (416) 867-3724
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE ANNE GILMOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILMOUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2015