Gimbel, Sarah Anne (CPSO#: 95390)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
New Vision Family Health Team
Unit 23B
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: (519) 578-6040
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Gimbel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gimbel ( CPSO# 95390 )

Business Address:
New Vision Family Health Team
421 Greenbrook Drive
Suite 23B
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone Number: (519) 578-3510

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ANNE GIMBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIMBEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2013