Gionet, Larry Roger (CPSO#: 29569)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Larry Gionet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gionet ( CPSO# 29569 )

Business Address:
1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8
Phone Number: (613) 727-1072

Medical Records Location

Address: Merivale Medical Imaging 1370 Clyde Ave Nepean, ON K2G 3H8 Phone: 613-727-1072
Date Received: 07 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2018