Girdhari, Rajesh Philip (CPSO#: 93004)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sumac Creek Health Centre
St Michael's Hospital FHT
Third Floor
73 Regent Park Blvd
Toronto ON  M5A 2B7
Phone: 416-864-3022
Fax: 416-864-6051
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rapid Access Clinic
17th Floor
St Michael's Hospital
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416-864-3082
Fax: 416-864-5480
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Regen Medical Clinic
Suite 103
5359 Dundas Ave West
Toronto ON  M9B 1B1
Canada
Phone: 416-233-4444
Fax: 855-779-7978
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St Joseph's Health Centre
Addiction Medicine Service
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: 416-530-6486 Ext. 3969
Fax: 416-530-6380
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJESH PHILIP GIRDHARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIRDHARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012