Giroux, Lyne Lucille (CPSO#: 73624)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400
336 Pine Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1X8
Phone: (705) 669-0002
Fax: (705) 669-1771
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lyne Giroux Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Giroux ( CPSO# 73624 )

Business Address:
400 - 336 Pine Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1X8
Phone Number: (705) 669-0002

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYNE LUCILLE GIROUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIROUX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2004