Gladstone, Jonathan Paul (CPSO#: 75040)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 122
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 492-4144
Fax: (416) 492-9864
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Headache Clinic
Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-8133
Fax: (416) 813-8105
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Cleveland Clinic Canada
181 Bay St #3000
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

550 University Avenue, Toronto
Toronto Rehabilitaiton Institute
WSIB Neurology Specialty Clinic
Complex Injury Outpt Rehabilitation
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Gladstone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gladstone ( CPSO# 75040 )

Business Address:
Gladstone Headache Clinic
Suite 122
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 492-4144

Business Address:
Toronto Rehabiliation Institute
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-5320

Business Address:
The Cleveland Clinic Canada
181 Bay Street
30th Floor
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Phone Number: (416) 507-6600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN PAUL GLADSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLADSTONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2005