Gladwell, Heather Elizabeth (CPSO#: 90480)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: Baerg, Heather Elizabeth (used until: 12 Jan 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Emergency Medicine
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Canada
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: (519) 370-4047
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gladwell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Gladwell ( CPSO# 90480 )
Dr. M. Gladwell ( CPSO# 90498 )

Business Address:
Suite 209
1101 2nd Avenue East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 2J1
Phone Number: (519) 376-1631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER ELIZABETH GLADWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLADWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011