Glassman, Steven Jeremy (CPSO#: 87346)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Feb 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dermatology Clinic
4th Floor Civic Parkdale Clinic
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone: (613) 761-4689
Fax: (613) 761-4087
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
75 Bruyere Street
Photoderm Clinic, 2nd floor
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Canada
Phone: (613) 562-6354
Fax: (613) 562-6022
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven J. Glassman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Glassman ( CPSO# 87346 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Room 13 Main Floor
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone Number: (613) 761-4689

Business Address:
Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
75 Bruyere Street
Photoderm Clinic, 2nd floor
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6354

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 05 Feb 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 09 Apr 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Steven Jeremy Glassman may practise medicine independently in dermatology.