Glaya, Aiser Omar (CPSO#: 80661)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CANADIAN MEDICAL ALLIANCE
Diagnostic Radiology
595 MONTREAL ROAD
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 749-3416
Fax: 613 745-4565
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
New Brunswick
Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 16 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AISER OMAR GLAYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLAYA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2004 to 23 Aug 2004
PEAP - Resident - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 2004 to 20 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 21 Sep 2004 to 20 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 21 Sep 2005 to 20 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 21 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2016