Gleba, Heather Joy (CPSO#: 96933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. Earl Health Centre
786 Goderich Street
Port Elgin ON  N0H 2C3
Phone: (226) 453-2230
Fax: (226) 453-2231
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Heather J. Gleba Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Gleba ( CPSO# 96933 )

Business Address:
Dr. Early Health Centre
786 Goderich Street
Port Elgin ON  N0H 2C3
Phone Number: (226) 453-2230

Business Address:
340 High Street
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 797-3230

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER JOY GLEBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLEBA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 23 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Jan 2012 to 23 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Jan 2013 to 03 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 04 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014