Glen, Peter Norman Campbell (CPSO#: 93549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
CPC Building Room 353
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER NORMAN CAMPBELL GLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2017