Glick, Daniel Noah (CPSO#: 93218)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL NOAH GLICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2018