Glikstein, Rafael Simon (CPSO#: 90838)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rafael Glikstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Glikstein ( CPSO# 90838 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Argentina
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Rafael Simon Glikstein may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Radiology,  University  of Ottawa, in which Dr. Glikstein holds and
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires when Dr. Glikstein
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.