Gluszynski, Malgorzata (CPSO#: 80833)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
Department of Family Medicine
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8219
Fax: (613) 738-8217
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital- Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALGORZATA GLUSZYNSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLUSZYNSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007