Gnanatissa, Asha Senani (CPSO#: 77225)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Colombo, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverstone Medical Centre
Unit 2
5 Cherrycrest Drive
Brampton ON  L6P 3W4
Phone: (905) 915-7910
Fax: (905) 915-7914
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asha Gnanatissa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gnanatissa ( CPSO# 77225 )

Business Address:
Riverstone Medical Centre
Unit 2
5 Cherrycrest Drive
Brampton ON  L6P 3W4
Phone Number: (905) 915-7910

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jan 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHA SENANI GNANATISSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GNANATISSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jan 2002 to 06 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jan 2002 to 06 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2004