Go, Cristina Yip (CPSO#: 85108)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Jul 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7353
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 15 Jul 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Jan 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Dec 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2009 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Cristina Yip Go may practise medicine independently in Neurology, only.