Go, Katharyn Rose S (CPSO#: 82920)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3931
Fax: (905) 721-4764
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

181 Green Lane East Unit 2
East Gwillimbury ON  L9N 0C9
Canada
Phone: 19058689243
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

5959 Anderson St
Whitby ON  L1M 2E9
Canada
Phone: 905-655-3321
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Katharyn Go Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Go ( CPSO# 82920 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
2 - 181 Green Lane East
East Gwillimbury ON  L9N 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 868-9243

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jul 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHARYN ROSE S GO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 21 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 22 Jul 2007 to 09 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2007