Goddard, Karin Grace (CPSO#: 58497)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2015