Goddard, Stephen Peter (CPSO#: 68394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Temagami Medical Centre
17 O'Connor Drive
Temagami ON  P0H 2H0
Phone: (705) 569-3244
Fax: (705) 569-2610
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Goddard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Goddard ( CPSO# 68394 )

Business Address:
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 647-8121

Business Address:
17 O'Connor Drive
Temagami ON  P0J 2H0
Phone Number: (705) 569-3244

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN PETER GODDARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GODDARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995