Gogia, Rupinder Kaur (CPSO#: 83995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Maharshi Dayanand University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1, 2732 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8E 4M6
Phone: (905) 560-6999
Fax: (905) 560-5801
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rupinder Kaur Gogia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gogia ( CPSO# 83995 )

Business Address:
Unit 1
2732 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8E 4M8
Phone Number: (905) 560-6999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Feb 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUPINDER KAUR GOGIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOGIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 25 Mar 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2006 to 15 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2007 to 15 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2008