Goh, Elaine Suk-Ying (CPSO#: 85010)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Genetics - Room 1A100
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4104
Fax: (905) 813-4347
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Sciences North
Sudbury Outpatient Centre
865 Regent St. S
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 1055
Fax: (705) 523-7178
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Goh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Goh ( CPSO# 85010 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital - Genetics
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Room 1A100
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-5104

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Sudbury Outpatient Care
865 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 18 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE SUK-YING GOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2011