Gohla, Gabriela Elisabeth (CPSO#: 80516)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 19 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Hamburg University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Pathology
L222 3
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35009
Fax: (905) 521-6192
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 28 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GABRIELA ELISABETH GOHLA may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF PATHOLOGY AND MOLECULAR MEDICINE, DIVISION OF ANATOMICAL PATHOLOGY, MCMASTER UNIVERSITY in which Dr. GOHLA holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. GOHLA may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. GOHLA no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. GOHLA no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. GOHLA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2010