Goindi, Reena (CPSO#: 90962)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Regional Cancer Center
503 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 1C4
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79452
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Canada
Phone: 6137287700
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REENA GOINDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOINDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 12 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2012