Goldberg, Mira (CPSO#: 95535)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS Juravinski Cancer Centre
Division of Radiation Oncology
699 Concession St
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIRA GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2018