Goldberg, Pamela Ruth (CPSO#: 61597)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto, ON, M2K 1E1
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6520
Fax: 8557563454
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Goldberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Goldberg ( CPSO# 61597 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6520

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA RUTH GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1996